VA SJR5 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); contributions to defined benefit retirement plans maintained for employees. Requires that contributions to defined benefit retirement plans that are maintained for state employees and employees of participating political subdivisions and school divisions be made in strict adherence with contribution rates and times for the payment of the contributions as recommended by the Board of Trustees of the Virginia Retirement System (VRS). Under the resolution, for the six fiscal years beginning on and after July 1, 2014, the General Assembly could make contributions at a rate that is less than the VRS recommended contribution rate without any deferred contributions being recognized so long as the contributions are at least equal to certain minimum amounts. In addition, for fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2020, the General Assembly could provide for the deferral of all or any portion of such contributions for any fiscal year in which the maximum amount is appropriated from the Revenue Stabilization Fund by a separate vote of a majority of all the members voting in each house. All contributions deferred would be required to be repaid within 10 years at an annual interest rate equal to the current actuarially calculated long-term rate of return as determined by VRS. The resolution also requires that retirement contributions deferred in 2010 be repaid by June 30, 2022. The resolution also specifies how certain other factors and variables used in setting contribution rates are to be determined.
Title
Constitutional amendment; contributions to defined benefit retirement plan maintained for employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2011-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2011-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100617D |