VA SJR46 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ46ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ46ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Thomas Anthony Fortkort.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Thomas Anthony Fortkort.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ46ER) |
2022-01-24 | House | Agreed to by House |
2022-01-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-01-21 | House | Received |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Presented 22100475D |