VA SJR455 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ455ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ455ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
South Vietnamese Recognition Day. Designates April 30, in 2013 and in each succeeding year, as South Vietnamese Recognition Day in Virginia.
Title
South Vietnamese Recognition Day; designating as April 30, 2013, and each succeeding year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ455ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-22 | House | Taken up |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13105347D |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |