VA SJR452 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ452ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ452ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Joseph A. Gutierrez, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Joseph A. Gutierrez, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Colgan [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. John Miller [D] |
Sen. Thomas Norment [R] | Sen. Walter Stosch [R] | Sen. John Watkins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ452ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House |
2013-02-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2013-02-21 | House | Received |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Presented 13105353D |