VA SJR45 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ45ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ45ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; awareness of abuse of adults and children with disabilities. Encourages the Department of Social Services to work together with public and private partners to conduct a comprehensive public awareness and education program on the identification, prevention, and reporting of abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults and children who have a disability.
Title
Adults and children with disabilities; DSS to conduct program on identifying abuse, neglect, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ45ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Taken up | |
2010-03-04 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10102378D-E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ45E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102378D |