VA SJR448 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ448ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ448ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Vinton Host Lions Club.
Title
Commending the Vinton Host Lions Club.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ448ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2013-02-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2013-02-21 | House | Received |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Presented 13105311D |