VA SJR43 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ43ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ43ER)
Summary
Memorial resolution; Yolanda Denise King. Expresses with great sadness the loss of Yolanda Denise King, eldest daughter of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. and Coretta Scott King, and “torch bearer of the dream.” This resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission.
Title
Memorial resolution; Yolanda Denise King.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ43ER) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2008-01-18 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2008-01-18 | House: Received | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/08 072708264 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ43 |