VA SJR40 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognition of the Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia. Recognizes the existence of the Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia within the Commonwealth.
Title
Recognition of the Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald McEachin [D] | Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Sen. Richard Stuart [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Tabled in Rules by voice vote |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103271D |