VA SJR4 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ4ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ4ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Westmoreland Volunteer Fire Department.
Title
Commending the Westmoreland Volunteer Fire Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ4ER) |
2024-01-15 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-01-12 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-01-12 | House | Received |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/10/24 24100191D |