VA SJR384 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ384ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ384ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Internet service providers in Virginia.
Title
Commending Internet service providers in Virginia.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ384ER) |
2023-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2023-02-22 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2023-02-22 | House | Received |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Presented 23106918D |