VA SJR384 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ384ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ384ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Diwali Day. Designates the last Saturday in October, in 2013 and in each succeeding year, as Diwali Day in Virginia.
Title
Diwali Day; designating as last Saturday in October 2013, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ384ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title replaced 13105190D-H1 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Agreed to by House with substitute 13105190D-H1 BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ384H1 |
2013-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13105190D-H1 |
2013-02-15 | House | Taken up |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 13105190D-H1 |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103954D |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |