VA SJR360 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ360ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ360ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reconfirming the appointment of the Director of the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries. Reconfirms the appointment of Robert W. Duncan as the Director of the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries.
Title
Game and Inland Fisheries, Department of; reconfirming appointment of Director.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ360ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15104913D |