VA SJR35 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ35ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ35ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding as the Joint Subcommittee on Recurrent Flooding for two additional years, through the 2023 interim. The resolution expands the review of the joint subcommittee to include riverine and stormwater flooding. The joint subcommittee is directed to recommend short-term and long-term strategies for minimizing the impact of flooding.
Title
Coastal Flooding, Joint Subcommittee on; continued as the Joint Subcommittee on Recurrent Flooding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ35ER) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 22107890D-S2 |
2022-03-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Hodges, Bloxom, Keam |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Lewis, Ebbin, Stuart |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request |
2022-03-10 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Agreed to by House with substitute 22107168D-H1 BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ35H1 |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107168D-H1 |
2022-03-08 | House | Taken up |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107168D-H1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ35S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105406D-S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105406D-S1 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103020D |
Same As/Similar To
HJ16 (Same As) 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER)
HJ16 (Same As) 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER)
HJ16 (Same As) 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER)