VA HJR16 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding as the Joint Subcommittee on Recurrent Flooding for two additional years, through the 2023 interim. The resolution expands the review of the joint subcommittee to include riverine and stormwater flooding. The joint subcommittee is directed to recommend short-term and long-term strategies for minimizing the impact of flooding.
Title
Coastal Flooding, Joint Subcommittee on; continued as the Joint Subcommittee on Recurrent Flooding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ16ER) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107878D-H1 |
2022-03-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Hodges, Bloxom, Keam |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senators: Lewis, Ebbin, Stuart |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107113D-S1 (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ16S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107113D-S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107113D-S1 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reading waived |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-08 | House | Taken up |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101938D |
Same As/Similar To
SJ35 (Same As) 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ35ER)
SJ35 (Same As) 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ35ER)
SJ35 (Same As) 2022-03-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ35ER)