VA SJR349 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ349ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ349ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Rebecca T. Dickson.
Title
Celebrating the life of Rebecca T. Dickson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ349ER) |
2017-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-03 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2017-02-03 | House | Received |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Presented 17104891D |