VA SJR325 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ325ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ325ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's interim appointments of certain persons. Confirms interim appointments made by Governor McDonnell of certain persons and communicated to the General Assembly August 2, 2010.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Lines 431-433 agreed to (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Lines 317-319 agreed to (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate in part (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Lines 431-433 agreed to (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Lines 317-319 agreed to (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate in part (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ325ER) | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-07 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-02-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Lines 431-433 agreed to (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Lines 317-319 agreed to (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate in part (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Certificate, Oath and Confirmation Review | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100137D |