VA SJR31 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ31ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ31ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC to study reading proficiency among third grade public school students. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study ways to promote and ensure early reading proficiency and comprehension among third graders in the public schools. In conducting its study, JLARC shall (i) determine the number of third graders who read at grade level; (ii) rank the school divisions according to the number of third graders who passed the most recent third grade reading test; (iii) identify best practices utilized by school divisions with the highest percentage of third graders who read at grade level; (iv) examine the findings and recommendations of state and national studies pertaining to the efficacy of early reading proficiency and comprehension and its relationship to academic success, and recommend those recommendations appropriate for implementation in Virginia; and (v) determine strategies to increase the number of third graders who pass the third grade reading test and ways to improve and sustain the early reading proficiency of third grade students. The Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission must submit an executive summary of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and 2011 and 2012 Sessions of the General Assembly.
Title
Public schools; JLARC to study reading proficiency among third graders.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ31ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Taken up | |
2010-03-04 | House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101899D |