VA SJR309 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ309ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ309ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Stephen Boddie Wiggins.
Title
Celebrating the life of Stephen Boddie Wiggins.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ309ER) |
2015-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House |
2015-01-30 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2015-01-30 | House | Received |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Presented 15100554D |