VA SJR308 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Study; JLARC; impact of COVID-19 on Virginia's public schools, students, and school employees; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the impact of COVID-19 on Virginia's public schools, students, and school employees, including (i) examining and determining reasons for barriers to student success in virtual and hybrid models as well as the overall impact of COVID-19 face-to-face learning restrictions on previously existing student achievement gaps, student achievement, and student well-being, including any disproportionate impact on at-risk populations; (ii) determining the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on staffing levels, including the impact of teacher and school employee retirements and resignations on delivery of instruction and the ability of local school boards to fully staff their needs, employment levels, and local budgets; (iii) determining the short-term and projected long-term changes in student enrollment in response to the COVID-19 pandemic and the impact of such changes on funding levels; (iv) determining the impact of implementing COVID-19 health and safety measures in public schools; (v) evaluating public schools' level of emergency preparedness to face another pandemic or statewide crisis and making recommendations to help guide planning for such events and (vi) examining programs that can address learning loss and identifying barriers to implementing those programs, including resource gaps. Study; JLARC; impact of COVID-19 on Virginia's public schools, students, and school employees; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the impact of COVID-19 on Virginia's public schools, students, and school employees, including (i) examining and determining reasons for barriers to student success in virtual and hybrid models as well as the overall impact of COVID-19 face-to-face learning restrictions on previously existing student achievement gaps, student achievement, and student well-being, including any disproportionate impact on at-risk populations; (ii) determining the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on staffing levels, including the impact of teacher and school employee retirements and resignations on delivery of instruction and the ability of local school boards to fully staff their needs, employment levels, and local budgets; (iii) determining the short-term and projected long-term changes in student enrollment in response to the COVID-19 pandemic and the impact of such changes on funding levels; (iv) determining the impact of implementing COVID-19 health and safety measures in public schools; (v) evaluating public schools' level of emergency preparedness to face another pandemic or statewide crisis and making recommendations to help guide planning for such events and (vi) examining programs that can address learning loss and identifying barriers to implementing those programs, including resource gaps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19; JLARC to study the impact on Virginia's public schools, students, and school employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2021-01-26SenatePrinted as engrossed 21102905D-E
2021-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SJ308E
2021-01-26SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-26SenateRead second time
2021-01-25SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
2021-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102905D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback