VA SJR295 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ295ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ295ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Spotsylvania County.
Title
Commending Spotsylvania County.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Ryan McDougle [R] |
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ295ER) |
2021-01-25 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2021-01-22 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2021-01-22 | House | Received |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Presented 21102293D |