VA SJR294 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR294

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ294ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; JLARC; costs of education; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the true cost of education in the Commonwealth and provide an accurate assessment of the costs to implement the Standards of Quality. Study; JLARC; costs of education; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the true cost of education in the Commonwealth and provide an accurate assessment of the costs to implement the Standards of Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JLARC; costs of education, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ294ER)
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N)
2021-02-24HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2021-02-24HouseTaken up
2021-02-19HouseReported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2021-01-26SenatePrinted as engrossed 21102747D-E
2021-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SJ294E
2021-01-26SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-26SenateRead second time
2021-01-25SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102747D

Same As/Similar To

SJR294 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback