VA SJR294 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Commission on Health Care to study eating disorders in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study eating disorders in the Commonwealth. In conducting its study, the Joint Commission on Health Care shall (i) determine the number of incidences of diagnosed eating disorders in Virginia; (ii) assess the adequacy of training provided public school educators; (iii) evaluate the adequacy of the curriculum relating to eating disorders in Virginia's medical and nursing schools and continuing education requirements for Virginia medical professionals; (iv) determine strategies by which Virginia can increase awareness of eating disorders, including their symptoms, effects, and preventive interventions; (v) assess the cost of treatment incurred by eating disorder patients borne by the Commonwealth's Medicaid program as well as by private health plans and employers; (vi) assess issues concerning access to care for eating disorders within the Commonwealth; (vii) generate recommendations for improving education, prevention, early detection, and treatment of eating disorders in Virginia and estimate the fiscal impact on the Commonwealth and private payers for the implementation of such strategies; and (viii) consider, as the Commission may identify, such other issues related to the objectives of this study. The Commission must submit its findings and recommendations to the 2012 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Eating disorders; Joint Commission on Health Care to study those diagnosed within State, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | House: Left in Rules | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-12-28 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102085D |