VA SJR29 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ29ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ29ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of George M. Hampton, Ph.D.
Title
Celebrating the life of George M. Hampton, Ph.D.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ29ER) |
2024-01-22 | House | Agreed to by House |
2024-01-19 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-01-19 | House | Received |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Presented 24100084D |