VA SJR289 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first reference); local government; sale of property; authority to grant perpetual easements to units of government. Allows easements on public property to be granted in perpetuity to a public body, political subdivision, or authority of the Commonwealth or to the United States of America or any of its departments or agencies. The requirement to advertise and publicly receive bids does not apply to easements conveyed to any such governmental entity.
Title
Constitutional amendment; authority to grant perpetual easements to units of government.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N 5-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N 5-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N 5-A) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102069D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR289 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote