VA SJR266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ266ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ266ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Washington Capitals.
Title
Commending the Washington Capitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ266ER) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-14 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-11 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-01-11 | House | Received |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/19 19100399D |