VA SJR26 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR26
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; scope and cost of penalizing possession Study; JLARC; scope and cost of penalizing possession of drugs as a felony. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the scope and cost of the current laws in the Commonwealth penalizing possession of drugs as a felony.
Title
Drugs; JLARC to study scope and cost of penalizing possession as a felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24102134D-E |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ26E |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102134D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR26 (Carry Over) 2024-02-23 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
HJR38 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
HJR38 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Subjects
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Narcotics and Drugs
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Narcotics and Drugs
Study Commissions Committees and Reports