VA SJR26 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; effects of the economic recession on public schools and families in Virginia. Directs the Virginia Commission on Youth to study the effects of the economic recession on public schools and families in Virginia. In conducting its study, the Commission on Youth shall (i) evaluate the effects of the economic crisis on public schools in Virginia; (ii) determine the number of school-age children affected by recent home foreclosures with the decline of the housing industry, the unemployment of a parent, and homelessness, and, if possible, correlate these events in the lives of school children to academic performance; (iii) determine whether the economic crisis has contributed to an increase in family dysfunction, unemployment, crime, familial breakdown, divorce and separation, substance abuse, mental health problems, school and college dropout rates, and domestic violence; (iv) ascertain how and which educational programs and services have been reduced or eliminated by public schools as a result of funding reductions due to the economic crisis; (v) determine whether there has been an increase in the number of homeless students in Virginia public schools, and the fiscal and programmatic effect of such increase; and (vi) determine ways to assist public schools, children, and their families in coping with the economic crisis so as to minimize adverse consequences to them and governmental agencies. In the course of its deliberations, the Commission on Youth shall provide opportunities for the participation of professional and community organizations, the corporate and faith communities, and other persons with expertise and interest in public and higher education, and the welfare of children and their families.
Title
Public schools and families; joint subcommittee to study effects of economic recession in State.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Rules | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ26S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105381D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105381D-S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2010-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103099D |