VA SJR245 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ245ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ245ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual Assault Awareness Month. Designates the month of April, in 2015 and in each succeeding year, as Sexual Assault Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Sexual Assault Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ245ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103465D |