VA SJR237 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ237ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ237ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Community Healthcare Association for 30 years of service to the Commonwealth.
Title
Commending the Virginia Community Healthcare Association for 30 years of service to the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ237ER) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-03-10 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2010-03-10 | House: Received | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 10105757D | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Presented 10105757D |