VA SJR23 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ23ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ23ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Black Maternal Health Week. Designates April 11 through April 17, in 2024 and in each succeeding year, as Black Maternal Health Week in Virginia.
Title
Black Maternal Health Week; designating as April 11-17, 2024, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ23ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Taken up |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103203D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR44 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ44ER)