VA SJR207 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ207ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ207ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Department of Veterans Services Benefits section.
Title
Commending the Virginia Department of Veterans Services Benefits section.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ207ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-03-06 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2018-03-06 | House | Received |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ207S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107819D-S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107819D-S1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18107258D |