VA SJR120 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ120ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ120ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Alliance of Boys & Girls Clubs.
Title
Commending the Virginia Alliance of Boys & Girls Clubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ120ER) |
2018-02-09 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-02-07 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2018-02-07 | House | Received |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Presented 18106361D |