VA SJR109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ109ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ109ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Leigh B. Middleditch, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Leigh B. Middleditch, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ109ER) |
2022-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House |
2022-02-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-02-18 | House | Received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Presented 22104925D |