VA SJR104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ104ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ104ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Brown v. Board of Education. Commemorating the sixtieth anniversary of Brown v. Board of Education.
Title
Commemorating the sixtieth anniversary of Brown v. Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ104ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Taken up |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented 14104027D |