VA SB999 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Grocery Investment Program and Fund. Creates the Virginia Grocery Investment Program and Fund to provide funding for the construction, rehabilitation, equipment upgrades, or expansion of grocery stores, small food retailers, and innovative food retail projects, defined in the bill, in underserved communities. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriations act. The bill incorporates SB 1189.
Title
Virginia Grocery Investment Program and Fund; created, report, effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB999S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB999S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105034D-S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB1189 (Dance) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105034D-S1 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100087D |