VA SB996 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Reconsideration of defeated action rejected by House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exemptions from boating safety education requirements. Exempts motorboat operators born prior to July 1, 1972, and who are residents of Virginia, from having to demonstrate compliance with boating safety education requirements before operating a motorboat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boating safety education; exemption for motorboat operators born prior to July 1, 1972.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 61-N) (Y: 39 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 16-N) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24HouseReconsideration of defeated action rejected by House
2015-02-24HouseVOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 61-N)
2015-02-24HouseDefeated by House (38-Y 61-N)
2015-02-24HouseSubstitute by Delegate Byron rejected 15105385D-H2
2015-02-24HouseCommittee substitute rejected 15105259D-H1
2015-02-24HousePending question ordered
2015-02-24HouseRead third time
2015-02-23HouseFloor substitute printed 15105385D-H2 (Byron)
2015-02-23HousePassed by for the day
2015-02-20HousePassed by for the day
2015-02-19HouseRead second time
2015-02-18HouseSubstitute bill reprinted 15105259D-H1
2015-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 15105259D-H1
2015-02-18HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2015-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
2015-02-12HouseAssigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources
2015-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2015-02-12HouseRead first time
2015-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-10SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 16-N)
2015-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10SenatePrinted as engrossed 15102348D-E
2015-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB996E
2015-02-10SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2015-02-10SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-10SenateRead second time
2015-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-05SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
2015-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2015-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102348D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291735.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB996
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB996+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB996E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB996H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB996H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S01V0046+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0345SB0996+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0380SB0996+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0384SB0996+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H0102V0013+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H01V0098+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2684+SB0996

Bill Comments

feedback