VA SB993 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB993
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
State Health Commissioner; local health director; additional degrees. Allows the State Health Commissioner and local health directors to either be physicians, as required under existing law, or possess a Doctor of Public Health degree, a Master of Public Health degree, or a doctoral degree in the area of public health as an alternative to the current requirement.
Title
State Health Commissioner; local health directors, qualifications.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB993S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106975D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106975D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104539D |
Same As/Similar To
SB993 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |