VA SB993 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB993

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

State Health Commissioner; local health director; additional degrees. Allows the State Health Commissioner and local health directors to either be physicians, as required under existing law, or possess a Doctor of Public Health degree, a Master of Public Health degree, or a doctoral degree in the area of public health as an alternative to the current requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health Commissioner; local health directors, qualifications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseContinued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB993S1
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106975D-S1
2020-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-03SenateRead second time
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106975D-S1
2020-01-30SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-01-16SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104539D

Same As/Similar To

SB993 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32117(n/a)See Bill Text
32130(n/a)See Bill Text
32134(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback