VA SB991 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Acquisition of title to an abandoned vessel; notification procedures. Changes the notification requirement that a landowner proceeding to acquire title to a vessel abandoned on his land or in water adjacent to his land publish notice in a newspaper of general circulation from three consecutive days to three consecutive issues.
Title
Acquisition of title to an abandoned vessel; changes notification procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB991ER) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103491D-E | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB991E | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103491D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1971 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)