VA SB982 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Endangered and threatened species. Authorizes the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries to adopt regulations that allow the (i) taking, possession, exportation, transportation, or release of fish or wildlife within or among designated experimental populations of a specific species, within the context of an approved conservation plan for the species, and (ii) incidental taking of certain endangered or threatened species of fish and wildlife as long as the project enhances the long-term survival of the species and the taking is at a minimum level. The bill exempts the incidental taking of animals from designated experimental populations from the currently authorized prohibitions and penalties. Currently, the Board may permit the taking, transportation, exportation, or possession of any endangered or threatened species of fish or wildlife only for zoological, educational, scientific, or preservation purposes.
Title
Endangered and threatened species; Board of Game and Inland Fisheries to adopt regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047) | |
2011-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 47 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB982ER) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101353D |