VA SB98 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary school teachers; probationary term of service; performance evaluation. Removes (i) the option for local school boards to extend the three-year probationary term of service for teachers by up to two additional years and (ii) the prohibition against school boards reemploying any teacher whose performance evaluation during the probationary term of service is unsatisfactory.
Title
Public elementary & secondary school teachers; probationary term of service, performance evaluation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 167 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB98ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House (65-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102414D |
Same As/Similar To
HB365 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)