VA SB972 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Vested rights; existing landscape cover materials. Provides that, notwithstanding any local ordinance to the contrary, an owner of real property who has an occupancy permit issued as of January 1, 2018, shall not be required to retrofit existing landscape cover materials. The bill further provides that such owner shall not be prohibited from continuing to use, supplement, or refurbish existing landscape cover materials at such property. This bill is identical to HB 1595.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vested rights; owners of property not required to retrofit existing landscape cover materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (13-Y 26-N) (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (13-Y 26-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB972ER)
2018-03-05SenateEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House (87-Y 11-N)
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N)
2018-02-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2018-02-21HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2018-02-15HouseRead first time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12SenateRead third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2018-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-02-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB972S1
2018-02-09SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106216D-S1
2018-02-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-09SenateRead second time
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106216D-S1
2018-02-06SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 2-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18105703D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522307(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB972
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB972+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB972S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB972ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S07V0049+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0450SB0972+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0368SB0972+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0702V0059+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H07V0112+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1187+SB0972
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1246SB0972+SB0972

Bill Comments

feedback