VA SB97 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB97

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices. Provides that it is an unlawful discriminatory housing practice for any political jurisdiction or its employees or appointed commissions to discriminate in the application of local land use ordinances or guidelines, or in the permitting of housing developments, on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, elderliness, familial status, or handicap. The bill also provides that it is an unlawful discriminatory housing practice for any political jurisdiction or its employees or appointed commissions to discriminate in the application of local land use ordinances or guidelines, or in the permitting of housing developments, because a housing development contains or is expected to contain affordable housing units occupied or intended for occupancy by families or individuals with incomes at or below 80 percent of the median income of the area where the housing development is located or is proposed to be located, unless the location of a development or proposed development is, at the time of municipal decision, within a census tract wherein more than 50 percent of the residential units house families or individuals at or below 80 percent of the area median income. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices, effective clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseContinued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
2020-02-21HouseRereferred to General Laws
2020-02-21HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108615D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20107057D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB97ES1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107057D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107057D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-12-04SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-12-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101209D

Same As/Similar To

SB97 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB97
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB97+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB97S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB97ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB97H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB97AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB97F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB97FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB97FES1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB97FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12C0069+SB0097
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0274+SB0097
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0457SB0097+SB0097
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0520SB0097+SB0097
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0524SB0097+SB0097
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11C0388+SB0097

Bill Comments

feedback