VA SB968 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-23 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-23 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee ballots. Provides that officers of election shall not reject an absentee ballot on the basis that the voter failed to include a middle name or initial on the ballot envelope if such failure is not material to determining whether the individual is entitled to vote absentee.
Title
Absentee ballots; officers of election shall not reject ballot if middle name is not on envelope.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-23 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101144D |