VA SB960 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee ballots; expediting the counting of absentee ballots returned by mail prior to election day. Provides that if a general registrar has opted to expedite the counting of absentee ballots returned by mail by opening the sealed ballot envelopes in accordance with law, the requirement that the absentee ballot return envelope and unopened ballot envelope be deposited into an appropriate container does not apply. Current law contains a contradiction that absentee ballot return envelopes and unopened ballot envelopes are to be deposited into an appropriate container while also allowing the sealed ballot envelopes to be opened so that they may be inserted into a ballot scanner machine or other secure ballot container.
Title
Absentee ballots; expediting counting of absentee ballots returned by mail prior to election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 275 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB960ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103086D |