VA SB954 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of marijuana; first offense; expungement; penalty. Reduces the penalties for possession of marijuana to a fine of not more than $500 and makes a first offense violation that has been deferred and dismissed under ?§18.2-251 eligible for expungement. Under current law, possession of marijuana is punishable by confinement in jail for not more than 30 days and a fine of not more than $500, either or both. The bill provides that any person seeking expungement of such first offense violation shall be assessed a $300 fee, of which $150 shall be paid into the Heroin and Prescription Opioid Epidemic Fund, created by the bill, and $150 shall be paid into the state treasury and credited to the Department of State Police. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019, except for the provisions related to the reduction of penalties for possession of marijuana, which shall become effective July 1, 2018. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon funding in a general appropriation act. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Marijuana; reduces penalties for possession to a fine of not more than $500.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-03-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-03-02 | House | Referred from Appropriations by voice vote |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB954S3 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 18107006D-S3 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18107006D-S3 (Norment) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 18106890D-S2 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 18106134D-S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106890D-S2 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106134D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105334D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 387.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |