VA SB952 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child support arrearage reduction program. Directs the Department of Social Services to establish a statewide child support arrearage reduction program whereby the total amount of an arrearage owed to the Department for the payment of public assistance to or for the benefit of a dependent child or children or their custodial parent by an obligor who is responsible for the support of such child or children or custodial parent whose household income is less than 150 percent of the federal poverty level shall be reduced upon timely payment of child support owed, pursuant to an agreement between the obligor and the Department. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act passed during the 2013 Session of the General Assembly, which becomes law.
Title
Child support; directs DSS to establish statewide arrearage reduction program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #4 |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB952S1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104408D-S1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104408D-S1 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Social Services |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101899D |