VA SB951 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eminent domain; written offer to purchase property. Requires a condemnor's written offer to purchase property prior to instituting a condemnation proceeding, and its written statement of the amount established as just compensation, to be on such condemnor's letterhead and signed by an authorized employee of such condemnor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain; written offer to purchase property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
2020-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB951ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104868D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251204(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback