VA SB944 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; possession and administration of epinephrine, insulin, and glucagon. Authorizes and provides liability protection for employees of a public or private institution of higher education who are authorized by a prescriber and trained in the administration of epinephrine, insulin, or glucagon to possess and administer such epinephrine, insulin, or glucagon. This bill is identical to HB 1746.
Title
Institutions of higher education; possession and administration of epinephrine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 304 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB944ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB944S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104796D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104796D-S1 |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100256D |
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Epinephrine
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Narcotics and Drugs
Epinephrine
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Narcotics and Drugs