VA SB944 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Home health and hospice organizations; reporting requirements concerning health professionals. Requires a director of a licensed home health organization, a director of a licensed hospice organization, and a director of an accredited home health organization exempt from licensure to report certain disciplinary actions against and certain disorders of health professionals to the Office of Licensure and Certification at the Department of Health.
Title
Home health and hospice organizations; reporting requirements concerning health professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 119 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB944ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House (90-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (19-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB944S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104346D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104346D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101782D |